OR HCR20 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 3, 2019 Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes standards of conduct applicable to Legislative Branch and other persons present in State Capitol. Prohibits conduct that constitutes harassment or sexual harassment and creates hostile work environment, that constitutes unlawful practice that aids or abets discrimination in place of public accommodation, or that is retaliation. Establishes procedures for persons to make confidential disclosures, nonconfidential] conduct reports or formal] conduct complaints concerning prohibited conduct. Provides authority for interim safety measures to be imposed. Establishes procedures under which investigations of potential violations of rules are performed and remedial measures are imposed. Establishes standards of confidentiality and transparency pertaining to investigations. Establishes Senate and House Committees on Conduct. Directs Legislative Equity Officer to ensure that each employee, intern, extern or volunteer is provided with copies of branch harassment avoidance policies and rules, procedures and rules to address instances of harassment, and respectful workplace policies. Directs officer to conduct exit interviews with each employee, intern, extern or volunteer who is separating from legislative service. Provides operative date and transition rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing standards of conduct for Legislative Branch and procedures for addressing violations of standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 3, 2019 Calendar.
2019-05-06HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-05-01HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Capitol Culture.
2019-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback