OR HCR19 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring February 6, 2011, Ronald Reagan Day in Oregon.
Title
Declaring February 6, 2011, Ronald Reagan Day in Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-03-29 | Motion to rerefer to Rules carried. Rereferred. | |
2011-03-24 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 29, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-03-23 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-03-21 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hcr1.dir/hcr0019.intro.html |