OR HCR11 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies lyrics to state song "Oregon, My Oregon" to reflect cultural, historical, economic and societal evolution of State of Oregon. Modifies lyrics to state song "Oregon, My Oregon" to reflect cultural, historical, economic and societal evolution of State of Oregon.
Title
Modifying lyrics to state song "Oregon, My Oregon" to reflect evolution of State of Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Lieber. Adopted. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Findley, Heard, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Johnson. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Read. Carried by Schouten. Adopted. Ayes, 47; Nays, 6--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Post, Reschke, Smith G; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Carried over to March 24, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Carried over to March 22, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |