OR HB5201 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 109, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Chapter 109, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by state agencies. Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by state agencies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Chapter 109, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2022. |
2022-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 7--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 23--Bonham, Cate, Evans, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Neron, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Scharf. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-02-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-28 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |