OR HB5043 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 535, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 535, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Water Resources Department for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain lottery moneys. Limits biennial expenditures for certain purposes from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and specified federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from other federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Water Resources Department; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Chapter 535, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019. |
2019-07-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-04 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |