OR HB5028 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 470, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 470, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of State Police for certain biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of State Police for certain biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain moneys or other revenues allocated to Parks and Natural Resources Fund for certain purposes. Modifies certain biennial appropriation made from General Fund to department. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of State Police; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 470, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 14, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Absent, 1--Kennemer; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Morgan, Prusak. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |