OR HB5025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 561, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 561, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Parks and Recreation Department for biennial expenses.] Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from lottery moneys for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds for certain purposes. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Parks and Recreation Department; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 561, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Noble. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |