OR HB5011 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 630, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 630, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Department of Energy.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Department of Energy; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | House | Chapter 630, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Barton, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Fagan, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Unger. |
2013-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |