OR HB5009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 217, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 217, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Columbia River Gorge Commission for biennial expenses. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Columbia River Gorge Commission; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 217, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 4--Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 6--Johnson, Olsen, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Wagner, Winters. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 2--Evans, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Nosse, Rayfield, Salinas, Schouten, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |