OR HB5009 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 543, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 543, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Department of Energy. Limits biennial expenditures by department from lottery moneys. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Department of Energy; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Motion to Rerefer (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Motion to Rerefer (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 543, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 3, 2017. |
2017-07-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 12--Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Winters. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Taylor, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 17--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Frederick, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed.Ayes, 32; Nays, 24--Barker, Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Kennemer, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-14 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-31 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-30 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |