OR HB5009 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 376, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter 376, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Board of Licensed Social Workers. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Board of Licensed Social Workers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | House | Chapter 376, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Thatcher; excused, 2--Beyer, Johnson. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-05-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 41; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson. |
2015-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-05-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |