OR HB4202 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 2, (2020 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 2, (2020 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies administrative provisions of corporate activity tax. Modifies administrative provisions of corporate activity tax. Exempts from taxation certain sales of milk and manufactured dwelling park nonprofit cooperatives. Allows unitary group taxpayer to exclude members lacking ties to state. Defines "cost inputs" for taxpayer engaged in farming operation, for purpose of calculating subtraction. Establishes methods for taxpayer engaged in farming operation to demonstrate percentage of goods sold in state compared to outside state for purposes of determining commercial activity. Specifies that taxpayer is required to register only one time. Provides that returns and allowances are allowed as offset against commercial activity in year that returns or allowances are made. Prescribes methods for apportionment of subtraction. Establishes penalties for failure to file annual return or failure to pay tax by due date of annual return. Requires minimum payment per quarter but bars penalty if taxpayer makes payment equal to required installment for corresponding quarter of prior year. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Chapter 2, (2020 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2020. |
2020-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barker, Barreto, Boshart Davis, Holvey. |
2020-06-25 | House | Second reading. |
2020-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-06-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |