OR HB4164 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Work Session scheduled.
Pending: House Revenue Committee
Hearing: Feb 19 @ 8:30 am in HR A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases rates metropolitan service district is authorized to tax to rates up to two percent. Requires all revenues from taxes above one percent to support individuals who are homeless or at risk of becoming homeless. Applies to ordinances approved by electors on and after effective date of Act and before January 2, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to metropolitan service districts; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseWork Session scheduled.
2020-02-17HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Revenue.
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback