OR HB4160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Student Success for Underrepresented Students in Higher Education. Directs task force to develop student success policy proposals focusing on increasing likelihood of student success in higher education for students from populations that are underrepresented in higher education enrollment. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to underrepresented students at public post-secondary institutions of education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |