OR HB4151 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 104, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires investigations of abuse of persons 65 years of age or older by Department of Human Services to be completed within 120 days from date of report of abuse except when concurrent criminal investigation is ongoing. Requires investigation of report of resident abuse to be completed within 120 days of date investigation was commenced. Directs department to adopt policies and guidelines to plan for development and standardization of resources and technology to create database, registry or other electronic record of reports and investigations of abuse, to standardize procedures and protocols for reports and investigations of abuse and to promote and coordinate communication and information sharing with law enforcement agencies. Directs department to establishÙ augment department's existing criminal background check system with regularly updated registry of persons working or seeking to work in certain facilities providing care to vulnerable persons and as home care workers. Becomes operative January 1, 2015. Requires department to notify adult foster home if person applying for admission is on probation, parole or post-prison supervision after being convicted of sex crime. Allows adult foster home to refuse admission to person, or to transfer or discharge resident, who is on probation, parole or post-prison supervision after being convicted of sex crime. Renames Oregon Elder Abuse Work Group and expands scope of work group's responsibilities. Requires work group to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2014. Changes definitions of "neglect" and "sexual abuse" for purposes of reports of abuse of elderly persons and residents of long term care facilities and residential facilities. Becomes operative January 1, 2015. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vulnerable persons; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 104, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-06SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-05SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2014-03-04SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-03-04HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hoyle, Gilliam. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-03-04HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2014-03-03HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-27HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-20HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2014-02-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2014-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2014-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-07HousePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4151
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4151/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4151/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4151/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4151/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4151/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4151/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20058
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20251
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318782
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319098

Bill Comments

feedback