OR HB4139 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 64, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 64, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes tax on rental price of construction, mining, earthmoving or industrial equipment, together with attachments and other equipment and tools, that is mobile and held primarily for rental. Directs Department of Revenue to administer heavy equipment rental tax program. Provides for pro rata distribution of two percent of gross tax revenues among counties that do not otherwise receive qualified heavy equipment rental tax revenues. Provides for distribution to counties of net tax revenues attributable to rentals made from locations in county. Directs county treasurer to distribute tax moneys to local taxing districts in accordance with property tax and interest distribution percentage schedule. Provides for temporary annual payments by or to equipment owner of any difference between heavy equipment rental tax and ad valorem property tax that would be assessed on such equipment if such equipment were subject to ad valorem property tax. Requires department to submit report regarding heavy equipment rental tax experience, including proposed tax rate to maintain revenue neutrality with respect to replacement of ad valorem property tax by heavy equipment rental tax, to interim committees related to revenue no later than July 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the taxation of certain heavy equipment; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 64, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Thatcher declared conflict of interest. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-03 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2018-03-03 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Barreto. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Parrish; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Greenlick. |
2018-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |