OR HB4134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 35, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 35, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides specific procedure for petitioning for removal of personally discriminatory restrictions from title of real property. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to real property; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 35, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Kruse. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey, Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Witt. |
2018-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |