OR HB4133 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue, in collaboration with Department of Human Services, to establish pilot program for disbursement of installment payments to personal income taxpayers of amounts equal to personal income tax dependent care credits. Applies to dependent care expenses paid during tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2022, and to disbursements made in calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, and before January 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to payment of dependent care credits in installments; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Measures/Overview/HB4133 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4133/Introduced |