OR HB4128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits disadvantaged business enterprise, minority-owned business, woman-owned business, business that service-disabled veteran owns or emerging small business to retain certification despite exceeding applicable cap on gross receipts if enterprise or business subcontracts to another certified enterprise or business not less than 20 percent of subcontract in which enterprise or business participates as required participant, enters into mentor relationship with other enterprise or business and o therwise remains eligible for certification. Requires contracting agency to establish technical assistance fund and reimburse expenses that enterprise or business incurs in connection with mentor relationship. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to certification requirements for certain classes of businesses; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4128 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4128/Introduced |