OR HB4127 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs school districts to provide age-appropriate instruction in oral health as part of health education curriculum. Directs Oregon Health Authority to establish and maintain Community Dental Health Coordinator Pilot Program to support school-based oral health programs. Establishes Community Dental Health Coordinator Pilot Program Fund. Requires authority to seek funding for pilot program. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022, if fund balance is at least $200,000 on January 1, 2022. Requires Oregon Health Authority to accept claims for reimbursement of costs related to care coordination surrounding school-based oral health services. Sunsets program and fund on June 30, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to oral health in schools; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Education. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |