OR HB4120 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 68, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 68, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to waive minimum fine in violation proceedings in certain circumstances. Authorizes court to waive minimum fine in violation proceedings in certain circumstances. Modifies types of documents that must accompany request for filing fee waiver or deferral by adult in custody. Specifies filing fees that may be charged in protective proceedings when petition requests multiple fiduciaries or multiple protective orders. Prohibits charging of filing fee when amended affidavit is filed in small estate probate case. Modifies manner of requesting filing fee waiver for writ of habeas corpus. Authorizes Chief Justice to direct or permit electronic court appearances. Authorizes presiding judge to order in-person appearance in specified circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to court proceeding modifications; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 68, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Frederick, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 4--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 6--Beyer, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority Report withdrawn. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 2--Bynum, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Sanchez, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2022-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2022-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |