OR HB4119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes sunset on provisions that allow students whose legal residence is not within school district to attend school in district as resident if student receives written consent. Removes sunset on authority of institution of higher education to sponsor public charter school. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sunsets in education laws; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Education. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Measures/Overview/HB4119 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4119/Introduced |