OR HB4117 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 45, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 45, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits requirement that State Landscape Contractors Board offer practical skills test option as substitute for examination. Allows use of practical skills test as partial substitute for examination. Reduces schedule for offering practical skills testing. Allows inclusion of written multiple choice questions as part of practical skills test. Allows testing for landscape contracting business practices class. Revises content required for 2017 board report to Legislative Assembly regarding practical skills testing and business practices class implementation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to State Landscape Contractors Board licensing processes; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Chapter 45, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016. |
2016-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Bates, Winters. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Carried over to 02-24 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Buckley, Buehler, Krieger, Olson. |
2016-02-04 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |