OR HB4114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 66, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 66, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires members of district school board for common school district or union high school district to file verified statement of economic interest with Oregon Government Ethics Commission. Requires members of district school board for common school district or union high school district to file verified statement of economic interest with Oregon Government Ethics Commission.
Title
Relating to public officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 66, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 3--Findley, Linthicum, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-22 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Scharf. |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 16--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Morgan, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stark, Weber, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Holvey, Nathanson, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |