OR HB4112 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to initiate, resume or suspend payment of certain increased benefits under Public Employees Retirement System on first day of calendar quarter following receipt of notice by board that benefit payments are or are not subject to Oregon personal income tax. Directs board to pay increased benefits not paid to person because board determined that payments were not subject to Oregon personal income tax if person later establishes that payments were subject to Oregon personal income tax. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to payments under the Public Employees Retirement System subject to Oregon personal income tax; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback