OR HB4103 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limits pharmacy benefit managers' ability to require or encourage enrollees to fill or refill prescription drugs at mail order pharmacy. Prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from requiring special credentialing or similar requirements for pharmacists licensed by State Board of Pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pharmacy benefit managers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback