OR HB4090 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state contracting agency that procures or intends to procure vehicle with diesel motor or engine to qualify vehicle for procurement by obtaining certification from manufacturer or vendor of vehicle that diesel motor or engine is capable of operating with blended fuel that consists of not less than 20 percent biodiesel. Requires state contracting agency that procures or intends to procure vehicle with diesel motor or engine to qualify vehicle for procurement by obtaining certification from manufacturer or vendor of vehicle that diesel motor or engine is capable of operating with blended fuel that consists of not less than 20 percent biodiesel. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to state contracting agency procurements of vehicles that use diesel; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Measures/Overview/HB4090 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4090/Introduced |