OR HB4090 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Strategic Resiliency Commission. Requires commission to develop and administer program for rebates and investments to provide incentives for increasing amount, availability and security of regional foodstuff supplies.
Title
Relating to regional foodstuff supplies.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4090 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4090/Introduced |