OR HB4090 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 10, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 10, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of Education to award grants to encourage participation in summer meals programs. Increases maximum amount allowed for grants awarded to encourage participation in afterschool snack program that provides meals and snacks at at-risk after-school care centers. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to school food programs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 10, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 3, 2014. |
2014-03-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2014-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2014-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |