OR HB4088 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force to Promote Social Equity in the Cannabis Industry. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to establish Cannabis Social Equity Program to provide discounted recreational marijuana licensure fees and other support to program participants.] Becomes operative January 1, 2021.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Directs task force to identify barriers to entry in cannabis industry, recommend investments in communities impacted by marijuana criminalization and recommend solutions, including legislation for cannabis social equity program. Sunsets December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a cannabis social equity program; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |