OR HB4081 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Human Services to use savings in temporary assistance for needy families program to increase amount of cash grants or to make additional investments in JOBS program. Requires Department of Human Services to use savings in temporary assistance for needy families program to increase amount of cash grants or to make additional investments in JOBS program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the temporary assistance for needy families program; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2018-02-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Early Childhood and Family Supports.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback