OR HB4071 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Chapter 17, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Chapter 17, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies description of persons eligible for targeted financial incentives in field of behavioral health. Modifies description of persons eligible for targeted financial incentives in field of behavioral health. Defines "marriage and family therapist associate" and "professional counselor associate." Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to mental health; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 17, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 7, 2022. |
2022-03-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 3--Findley, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sosa. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 3--Cate, Morgan, Wallan; Excused, 5--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Nelson, Prusak, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Breese-Iverson, Holvey, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 17, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-15 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-14 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2022-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |