OR HB4069 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that fixed percentage of certain forecasted video lottery revenues be transferred to counties for economic development. Provides that disbursals to counties from video lottery revenues be adjusted to compensate for differentials between previous biennium's forecasted revenues and actual revenues. Provides that amount transferred to counties from video lottery revenue must be calculated as if certain transfers of lottery revenues to Public Employees Retirement Fund were not made. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to lottery revenues; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Armand Vial [R] | Sen. Rod Monroe [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |