OR HB4068 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Chapter 5, (2012 Laws): Effective date February 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Chapter 5, (2012 Laws): Effective date February 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to food banks; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to food banks; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Chapter 5, (2012 Laws): Effective date February 27, 2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-21 | President signed. | |
2012-02-21 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Atkinson, Bates, Girod. | |
2012-02-17 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2012-02-14 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-13 | Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Komp. | |
2012-02-10 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-07 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |