OR HB4062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 53, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 53, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes noncommercial pesticide applicator license and noncommercial pesticide trainee's certificate. Authorizes State Department of Agriculture to establish by rule types or classes of licenses or certificates for persons using pesticides.] Establishes noncommercial pesticide applicator license and noncommercial pesticide trainee's certificate. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to licensing of persons using pesticides; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 53, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Robinson. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Scharf. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Morgan, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Holvey. |
2022-02-17 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, and Water. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |