OR HB4030 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Information Technology Project Accountability. Prescribes membership and duties for task force. Sunsets task force on date of convening of 2016 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to accountability for information technology projects; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Freeman [R] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-14 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |