OR HB4023 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 51, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 51, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Broadband Advisory Council to submit report to interim legislative committee, no later than December 1, 2018, regarding proposed local broadband champion program structure. Establishes Connecting Oregon Schools Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Education for purpose of providing matching funds for federal moneys received by school districts for providing broadband access to eligible schools. Permits State Chief Information Officer to provide broadband services and operations to additional public bodies, Indian tribes and communities of interest. Requires State Chief Information Officer to adopt rules, in consultation with broadband services advisory committee, for providing broadband services and operations to additional public bodies, Indian tribes and communities of interest if services would duplicate] directly compete with services already offered by telecommunications provider. Provides exceptions.] Permits State Chief Information Officer to enter into contract related to broadband infrastructure for period exceeding 10 years. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to broadband technology; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Information Management and Technology, then to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Information Management and Technology, then to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 51, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Marsh, Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Keny-Guyer. |
2018-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Information Management and Technology then to Ways and Means by order of the Speaker. |
2018-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Information Management and Technology, and then Ways and Means. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |