OR HB4020 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain residential general contractors proposing remodel or repair project of more than $20,000 in value to tour residential structure with property owner and provide property owner with itemized and detailed description for each feature of proposed construction work. Requires certain residential general contractors proposing remodel or repair project of more than $20,000 in value to tour residential structure with property owner and provide property owner with itemized and detailed description for each feature of proposed construction work. Limits amount contractor may collect before completion and before property owner's approval and acceptance of itemized and described construction features. Requires contractor to request mediation by Construction Contractors Board before bringing action or suit or pursuing other remedies to collect payment from property owner that unreasonably withholds approval and acceptance. Applies to contracts entered into on or after January 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to construction contractors; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Christine Goodwin [R] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] |
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Measures/Overview/HB4020 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4020/Introduced |