OR HB4006 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires individual and group health insurance policies to reimburse services provided by naturopathic physicians within scope of their practice if services are reimbursed when provided by licensed physicians. Requires individual and group health insurance policies to reimburse services provided by naturopathic physicians within scope of their practice if services are reimbursed when provided by licensed physicians. Requires reimbursement paid to naturopathic physician in independent practice to be in same amount as reimbursement paid to physician.
Title
Relating to naturopathic physicians.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] |
Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |