OR HB4004 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 39, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 39, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to distribute grants to behavioral health care providers for staff compensation and workforce retention and recruitment. Requires Oregon Health Authority to distribute grants to behavioral health care providers for staff compensation and workforce retention and recruitment. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Requires authority to contract with nurses and behavioral health professionals to provide care in residential behavioral health facilities, opioid treatment programs, withdrawal management programs and sobering centers to address shortage of staff caused by COVID-19 pandemic. Sunsets January 2, 2027. Authorizes Oregon Youth Authority to provide grants to local government units, nonprofit organizations and individuals to meet treatment and care needs of individuals committed to custody of youth authority. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to financial resources available to provide care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 39, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Breese-Iverson, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-28 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2022-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |