OR HB3668 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 50, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 50, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to persons subject to regulation by the Oregon Board of Licensed Professional Counselors and Therapists; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to persons subject to regulation by the Oregon Board of Licensed Professional Counselors and Therapists; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Chapter 50, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Morrisette. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-19 | Carried over to 02-20 by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-18 | Carried over to 02-19 by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-17 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2010-02-10 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-09 | Third reading. Carried by Maurer. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem. | |
2010-02-08 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |