OR HB3659 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 47, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 47, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health insurance; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to health insurance; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Chapter 47, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Telfer. | |
2010-02-23 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-19 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-19 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. | |
2010-02-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-08 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Accountability. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |