OR HB3646 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Chapter 3, (2010 Laws): Effective date February 24, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Chapter 3, (2010 Laws): Effective date February 24, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public borrowing; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to public borrowing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Chapter 3, (2010 Laws): Effective date February 24, 2010. | |
2010-02-24 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-23 | President signed. | |
2010-02-23 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Morse. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-19 | Carried over to 02-20 by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Finance and Revenue. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. | |
2010-02-11 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Revenue. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |