OR HB3627 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to graduate facilities at Oregon State University Cascades Campus; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to graduate facilities at Oregon State University Cascades Campus; appropriating money; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Conger [R] | Rep. John Huffman [R] | Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Sen. Chris Telfer [R] |
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-26 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-06 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-07 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hb3600.dir/hb3627.intro.html |