OR HB3515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that city with population greater than 600,000 may refer ballot measure to electors to form park and recreation district and have entirety of governing body of city serve as entirety of membership of board of district so formed. Provides that city with population greater than 600,000 may refer ballot measure to electors to form park and recreation district and have entirety of governing body of city serve as entirety of membership of board of district so formed. Requires approval of county in which majority of territory of city lies if ballot measure includes permanent rate limit for operating taxes for district.
Title
Relating to park and recreation districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |