OR HB3494 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 391, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 391, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to erect and maintain roadside memorial sign for Tyrone Woods.
Title
Relating to roadside memorial signs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | Chapter 391, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bailey. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, President Courtney. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barton, Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Gilliam, Gorsek, Hanna, Jenson, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-04-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-04-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |