OR HB3466 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Oregon Business Development Department to award grants to cities and Oregon Indian tribes with high poverty rates for purpose of developing local poverty reduction plans. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Business Development Department to award grants to communities] cities and Oregon Indian tribes with high poverty rate] rates for purpose of developing local poverty reduction plans. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to poverty reduction; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Small Business with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |