OR HB3420 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensures that private sector labor organizations and employers throughout state may enter into union security agreements to full extent allowed by federal law. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to union security agreements; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-21 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-03-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |