OR HB3417 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 344, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 344, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands landlord guarantee program to include landlords providing housing to tenants who have received rental assistance under specified rehousing initiative. During state of emergency due to homelessness, allows Housing and Community Services Department to expand] Expands landlord guarantee program to include landlords providing housing to tenants receiving other] who have received rental assistance under specified rehousing initiative. Sunsets January 2, 2026.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing choice landlord guarantee program; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] |
Rep. Annessa Hartman [D] | Rep. Emerson Levy [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Chapter 344, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023. |
2023-07-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 51; Excused, 7--Evans, Goodwin, Hieb, Javadi, Nathanson, Smith G, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Owens, Tran. |
2023-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-04 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |