OR HB3415 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 451, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 451, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to both adopt written policies and require certain individuals to participate in annual training on sexual harassment, sexual assault, domestic violence, dating violence and stalking. Establishes required content for policies and training.
Title
Relating to policies adopted by post-secondary institutions of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 451, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 2--Hansell, Johnson. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Nearman, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nathanson. |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |